ME LD1298 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Update Maine's Water Quality Standards
Title
An Act To Update Maine's Water Quality Standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-574), in concurrence. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-574) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-02-01 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-01-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-574). |
2018-01-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-01-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2017-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |