ME LD1251 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Lower Costs to Municipalities and Reduce Energy Consumption through Increased Competition in the Municipal Street Light Market
Title
An Act To Lower Costs to Municipalities and Reduce Energy Consumption through Increased Competition in the Municipal Street Light Market
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin moved to to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Bill and accompanying papers , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-472), in concurrence.. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-472) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Report ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF REPORT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Report READ. |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-472) |
2013-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY, in concurrence. |
2013-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |