ME LD1246 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect the Health and Safety of Maine State Park Visitors and Staff

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect the Health and Safety of Maine State Park Visitors and Staff

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-30HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-25SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-04-25SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
2019-04-25SenateREAD ONCE
2019-04-25SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-23HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2019-04-23HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-23HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-03-19SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
2019-03-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2019-03-14HouseCommittee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback