ME LD1246 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen Laws Regarding the Manufacture and Sale of Methamphetamine and Other Drugs
Title
An Act To Strengthen Laws Regarding the Manufacture and Sale of Methamphetamine and Other Drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-280) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-337) thereto |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-280) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-337) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-280) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-337) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-337) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-280) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-280) was ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-280) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending Enactment, in concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-280). |
2015-06-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-280) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-23 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-23 | House | On motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-23 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-18 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2015-06-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-280) |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-280) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-07 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2015-04-07 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |