ME LD123 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Clarify the Processes Regarding Registration of Recovery Agencies for Tissue and Organ Donation
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Clarify the Processes Regarding Registration of Recovery Agencies for Tissue and Organ Donation
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Rep. Charles Kruger [D] | Sen. John Cleveland [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] |
Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Michel Lajoie [D] | Rep. Mary Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - Final Passage RC #204 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 204 (Yeas 138 - Nays 0 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-05 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2013-05-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-149). |
2013-05-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-149) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-149) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-01-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2013-01-29 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |