ME LD1224 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 1224 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 1224 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Child Protective Services Laws
Title
An Act To Amend the Child Protective Services Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #720 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #672 (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - Recede And Concur RC #567 (Y: 73 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Adopt Sas-462 To Cah-629 RC #618 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #672 (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - Recede And Concur RC #567 (Y: 73 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Adopt Sas-462 To Cah-629 RC #618 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | LD 1224 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2016-04-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 672V 147 having voted in the affirmative and 1 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2016-04-29 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) |
2016-04-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-629). |
2016-04-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 567 (Yeas 73 - Nays 77 - Absent 1 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Motion of Representative MALABY of Hancock to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-462) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-462) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 618 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington Senate Amendment "A" (S-462) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) READ |
2016-04-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Subsequently, the Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report in concurrence |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Report READ |
2016-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) |
2016-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-14 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-04-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-04-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-04-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-04-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |