ME LD12 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - LD 12 In Senate, April 18, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 IN FAVOR and 2 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - LD 12 In Senate, April 18, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 IN FAVOR and 2 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Incorporate Protections for Living Donors into Maine Law
Title
An Act To Incorporate Protections for Living Donors into Maine Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #77 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #29 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #29 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | LD 12 In Senate, April 18, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 IN FAVOR and 2 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 29V 146 having voted in the affirmative and 0 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2017-04-13 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-03-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-6), in concurrence. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-6) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2017-03-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-03-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-6). |
2017-03-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2017-03-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-01-05 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |