ME LD1186 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Address Electricity Costs of Agricultural Fairs
Title
An Act To Address Electricity Costs of Agricultural Fairs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-16 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-228), in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-228) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-228). |
2019-05-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2019-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |