ME LD1167 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 474 Yeas 20 - Nays 12 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to Fair Chance in Employment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating to Fair Chance in Employment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Senate - Enactment RC #474 (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #471 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Adopt Hah-742 To Cah-305 RC #409 (Y: 80 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #224 (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amended RC #138 (Y: 78 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 474 Yeas 20 - Nays 12 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
2021-06-30SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-30HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-30SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 471 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-30SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-305) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-742) thereto in concurrence
2021-06-30HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-30HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2021-06-30HouseSubsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-305) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-742) thereto.
2021-06-30HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-305) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-742) thereto was ADOPTED.
2021-06-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 409 (Yeas 80 - Nays 59 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
2021-06-30HouseOn further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-742) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-305) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-30HouseOn further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-305).
2021-06-30HouseOn further motion of same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-305).
2021-06-30HouseOn motion of Representative TALBOT ROSS of Portland, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-30HouseBill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1288)
2021-06-09SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-305) in concurrence
2021-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-305) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-07SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 224 Yeas 23 - Nays 10 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
2021-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec Report A Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendmend "A" (H-305) ACCEPTED.
2021-06-07SenateReports Read
2021-06-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-03HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-305).
2021-06-03HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-03HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-305) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-03HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-03HouseROLL CALL NO. 138 (Yeas 78 - Nays 55 - Absent 18 - Excused 0)
2021-06-03HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-03HouseReports READ.
2021-06-02JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-04-26JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-04-26JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-18HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-03-18HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1167&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0845&item=1&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0845&item=5&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0845&item=2&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0845&item=4&snum=130
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN116701.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN116702.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN116704.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN116705.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079755&chamber=House&serialnumber=138
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079755&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=224
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079755&chamber=House&serialnumber=409
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079755&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=471
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079755&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=474

Bill Comments

feedback