ME LD1163 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding Energy, Utilities and Technology

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding Energy, Utilities and Technology

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-16HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-16HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION
2019-05-16HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-05-14SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION
2019-05-14SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2019-03-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-07HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-03-07SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback