ME LD1161 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Modify the Deed for a Parcel of Property in the Town of Carrabassett Valley
Title
Resolve, To Modify the Deed for a Parcel of Property in the Town of Carrabassett Valley
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-19 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-05-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-13 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-05-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-05-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-05-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-31 | House | Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-03-31 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |