ME LD1160 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce the Burden on Courts and Promote the Resolution of Civil Cases
Title
An Act To Reduce the Burden on Courts and Promote the Resolution of Civil Cases
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Sen. David Miramant [D] |
Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #401 (Y: 71 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #363 (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #363 (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 401V 71 having voted in the affirmative and 73 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2021-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2021-06-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-590) in concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-590) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 363 Yeas 21 - Nays 11 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-590) ACCEPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-590). |
2021-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-590) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-18 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021. |