ME LD1085 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Renewable Energy Feed-in Tariff
Title
An Act To Establish the Renewable Energy Feed-in Tariff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #431 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2014-03-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-04 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-04 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative HOBBINS of Saco moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2014-03-04 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-02-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 431 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON Tabled pending motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin to Accept the Majority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin moved ACCEPTANCE of Majority Ought Not To Pass Report Roll Call Ordered |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reports READ |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-03-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-20 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed |