ME LD108 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow a Law Enforcement Agency That Treats a Person with Naloxone Hydrochloride To Bill That Person for That Treatment
Title
An Act To Allow a Law Enforcement Agency That Treats a Person with Naloxone Hydrochloride To Bill That Person for That Treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R] |
Rep. Richard Cebra [R] | Rep. Karen Gerrish [R] | Rep. Lloyd Herrick [R] | Rep. Karleton Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #87 (Y: 81 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report READ and ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 87 (Yeas 81 - Nays 67 - Absent 2 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-11 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |