ME LD1067 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Create the Commission to Study the Operations of the Maine Legislature
Title
Resolve, to Create the Commission to Study the Operations of the Maine Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. William Faulkingham [R] |
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Peter Lyford [R] | Rep. Sawin Millett [R] | Rep. Maureen Terry [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #218 (Y: 78 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Accept Minority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #307 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Accept Minority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #307 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-06-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 218 (Yeas 78 - Nays 70 - Absent 2 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative STOVER of Boothbay, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 307 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator NANGLE of Cumberland The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-09 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2023-05-09 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-04-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-20 | House | Subsequently, the Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-04-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-03-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-03-07 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Resolve was TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |