ME LD1053 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Present Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Present Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Stimulate Investment in Innovation by Maine Businesses To Produce Nationally and Globally Competitive Products and Services
Title
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Stimulate Investment in Innovation by Maine Businesses To Produce Nationally and Globally Competitive Products and Services
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Luchini [D] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Mark Eves [D] |
Rep. Sara Gideon [D] | Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] | Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] |
Sen. Margaret Rotundo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-15 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #636 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Present Required, in concurrence. |
2016-04-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-15 | House | This being a Bond Authorization Act, in accordance with Section 14 of Article 9 of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all those present was necessary. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-680), in concurrence. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-680) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-680). |
2016-04-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-04-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-680) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-04-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 636 (Yeas 134 - Nays 10 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-15 | House | The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-15 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative FREDETTE of Newport REMOVED. |
2016-04-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-07-16 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 994. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 994. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hamper of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, in concurrence. |
2015-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |