ME LD104 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Replace the Earned Income Tax Credit with the Maine Work Credit
Title
An Act To Replace the Earned Income Tax Credit with the Maine Work Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #308 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-297). |
2019-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-297) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-297) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-297) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 308 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-297) Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-01-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |