ME LD1035 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a 9-month Time Limit on General Assistance Benefits
Title
An Act To Create a 9-month Time Limit on General Assistance Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Sen. Garrett Mason [R] |
Rep. Frances Head [R] | Rep. Matthew Peterson [D] | Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R] | Rep. Karen Vachon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #370 (Y: 74 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #83 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #83 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-06-23 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-23 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-85) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-22 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2015-06-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 370 (Yeas 74 - Nays 71 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-22 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-22 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-26 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-05-26 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-05-26 | House | Representative GATTINE of Westbrook moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-05-26 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-85) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-85) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 83 24 Yeas - 11 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Subsequently, On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to Accept the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-85) Report |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-03-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-24 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2015-03-24 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |