ME LD1025 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Law Pertaining to Staff in the Office of the Attorney General
Title
An Act To Amend the Law Pertaining to Staff in the Office of the Attorney General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #169 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-20 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #99 (Y: 78 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #99 (Y: 78 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-06-06 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-06-06 | Senate | (S.P. 350) (L.D. 1025) "An Act to Amend the Law Pertaining to Staff in the Office of the Attorney General" In Senate, June 6, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 IN FAVOR and 15 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-90). |
2013-05-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-05-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-90) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-20 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-05-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 99 (Yeas 78 - Nays 59 - Absent 14 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-20 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-05-20 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-05-20 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan TABLED pending the motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-05-20 | House | Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-05-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-90). |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-90) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-03-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed |