ME LD1022 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Agricultural Workers and Other Workers Employees under the Wage and Hour Laws
Title
An Act To Make Agricultural Workers and Other Workers Employees under the Wage and Hour Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Rep. Traci Gere [D] | Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] |
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Laurie Osher [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #327 (Y: 61 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 327 (Yeas 61 - Nays 80 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-16 | House | Motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |