ME LD1017 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Let the Citizens of the State Choose Their State Auditor
Title
An Act To Let the Citizens of the State Choose Their State Auditor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Report 'a' Ontp RC #282 (Y: 81 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot Report A Ought Not to Pass ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 282 (Yeas 81 - Nays 61 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | Subsequently, REPORT A Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought Not to Pass Later today assigned. |
2021-06-02 | House | Representative MATLACK of St. George moved to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought Not to Pass |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |