ME LD1008 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Joint Use Entities To Establish Permanent Liaisons with All County Emergency Management Agencies
Title
An Act To Require Joint Use Entities To Establish Permanent Liaisons with All County Emergency Management Agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Tepler [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] |
Rep. Sean Paulhus [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-133) in concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-133) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-133). |
2021-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-133) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP |
2021-04-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Bill was REFERRED to the Committees on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed. |