ME LD1006 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Transparency of Medical Provider Profiling Programs Used by Insurance Companies and Other Providers of Health Insurance
Title
An Act To Clarify Transparency of Medical Provider Profiling Programs Used by Insurance Companies and Other Providers of Health Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Treat [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Sen. Richard Woodbury [D] | Rep. Paulette Beaudoin [D] |
Rep. Anne Graham [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mccabe [D] | Sen. Margaret Rotundo [D] | Rep. Stephen Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-502), in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-502) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-502) |
2013-06-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gratwick of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES, in concurrence. |
2013-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |