ME HP1279 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Subsequently ADOPTED in concurrence
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Subsequently ADOPTED in concurrence
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION MEMORIALIZING THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES AND THE UNITED STATES CONGRESS TO EXCLUDE THE STATE OF MAINE FROM OFFSHORE OIL AND GAS DRILLING AND EXPLORATION ACTIVITIES
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MEMORIALIZING THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES AND THE UNITED STATES CONGRESS TO EXCLUDE THE STATE OF MAINE FROM OFFSHORE OIL AND GAS DRILLING AND EXPLORATION ACTIVITIES
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Devin [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Robert Alley [D] |
Rep. Kevin Battle [R] | Rep. Lydia Blume [D] | Sen. Robert Foley [R] | Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] |
Rep. Walter Kumiega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Subsequently ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION in concurrence |
2018-02-20 | Senate | READ |
2018-02-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-15 | House | READ and ADOPTED. |