ME HP1067 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-31 - Subsequently, ADOPTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-31 - Subsequently, ADOPTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION TO RECOGNIZE THE FIRST WEDNESDAY IN APRIL AS EVERYONE MATTERS DAY
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION TO RECOGNIZE THE FIRST WEDNESDAY IN APRIL AS EVERYONE MATTERS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | Senate | Subsequently, ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION, in concurrence. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | READ. |
2013-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-29 | House | READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-04-30 | House | Not Presented. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?paper=HP1067&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1067&item=1&snum=126 |