ME HP0754 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION HONORING THE MAINE STATE HOUSING AUTHORITY ON ITS 50TH ANNIVERSARY
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION HONORING THE MAINE STATE HOUSING AUTHORITY ON ITS 50TH ANNIVERSARY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2019-03-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-21 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Joint Resolution and accompanying papers. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-03-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Joint Resolution and accompanying papers In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION |
2019-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | READ and ADOPTED. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?paper=HP0754&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0754&item=1&snum=129 |