MD SB991 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Hearing 3/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Hearing 3/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to temporarily stop collecting tolls for the William Preston Lane, Jr. Memorial Bridge (Chesapeake Bay Bridge) under specified congested traffic conditions; requiring the Authority to resume collecting tolls when specified congested traffic conditions no longer exist; requiring the Authority to take specified action to obtain a necessary modification of a specified trust agreement; etc.
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Tolls
Sponsors
Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Hearing 3/24 at 2:15 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:15 p.m. | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-10 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-22 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0991.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0991f.pdf |