MD SB986 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to ensure that the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program complies with certain provisions of the Insurance Article relating to the coverage of contraceptive drugs and devices and male sterilization.
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-2) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {347178/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Birth Control
Budget and Management, Department of
Drugs
Equipment
Gender
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Budget and Management, Department of
Drugs
Equipment
Gender
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel