MD SB978 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Garrett County and the Board of Governors of the Garrett County Memorial Hospital to lease the hospital or certain portions of the hospital under certain circumstances; and providing for alterations to the Board of Governors under certain circumstances.
Title
Garrett County Memorial Hospital - Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {113028/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1471 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Emergency Bills
Garrett County
Hospitals
Land Records
Leases and Rent
Real Property
Records
Residency
Titles
County Commissioners
Emergency Bills
Garrett County
Hospitals
Land Records
Leases and Rent
Real Property
Records
Residency
Titles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Garrett County | 36.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Garrett County | 36.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |