MD SB974 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying an exception to the definition of the term "entity" to include a governmental unit that employs an individual regulated lobbyist for the purposes of allowing certain officials and employees to accept certain gifts under certain circumstances; and repealing a provision of law that exempts from regulation of lobbying activities an appearance of a certain employee of an association engaged only in representing counties or municipal corporations under certain circumstances.
Title
Public Ethics - Lobbyists - Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1055 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Ethics
Gifts
Lobbying
Municipal Corporations
Public Officials
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Ethics
Gifts
Lobbying
Municipal Corporations
Public Officials
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 5 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |