MD SB966 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State Department of Education to make a procurement on an expedited basis with the approval of the State Board of Education; authorizing virtual schools to operate on a year-round basis; requiring the Department, in accordance with the expedited procurement process, to issue a request for proposals for a statewide platform to provide virtual education on or before May 1, 2021; requiring the Department to award a contract for the virtual education platform on or before June 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virtual Schools – Statewide Education Platform – Procurement and Establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateHearing canceled
2021-03-24SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-09SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-21SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7103(n/a)See Bill Text
Education71401(n/a)See Bill Text
Education71402(n/a)See Bill Text
Education71403(n/a)See Bill Text
Education71405(n/a)See Bill Text
Education71407(n/a)See Bill Text
Education71409(n/a)See Bill Text
Education71410(n/a)See Bill Text
Education7209(n/a)See Bill Text
Education9113(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback