MD SB965 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from having a direct or indirect interest in more than a certain number of Class B-H (hotel), Class B-R (restaurant), and Class B-RB (restaurant/bar) on-sale beer, wine, and liquor licenses in any combination in Charles County.
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 776 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {133227/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1423 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-24 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Charles County
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Charles County
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 18 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 18 | 1606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |