MD HB1423 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Charles County to allow a person to obtain a direct or indirect interest in, in addition to certain other licenses, not more than a certain number of Class B-H (hotel), Class B-R (restaurant), or Class B-RB (restaurant/bar) on-sale beer, wine, and liquor licenses.
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB965 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 776
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Charles County
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Charles County
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 18 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 18 | 1606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |