MD SB964 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1045
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1045
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the holder of a Class B or Class D alcoholic beverages license in Carroll County or an individual designated by the license holder who has completed training in an approved alcohol awareness program to be present on the licensed premises at certain times when alcoholic beverages may be sold; providing for certain penalties; and requiring at least one license holder to maintain alcohol awareness program certification while listed on the license.
Title
Carroll County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Alcohol Awareness Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1045 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {243124/1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Awareness and Outreach
Carroll County
Certifications
Fines
Job Training
Penalties and Sentences
Substance Abuse
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Awareness and Outreach
Carroll County
Certifications
Fines
Job Training
Penalties and Sentences
Substance Abuse
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 16 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 16 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 16 | 1904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |