MD SB960 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain individuals who are members of the Employees' Pension System of the State Retirement and Pension System from becoming a member of the Optional Retirement Program of the State Retirement and Pension System on or after a certain date; prohibiting certain individuals from continuing membership in the Optional Retirement Program on or after a certain date; requiring certain individuals to resume participation as a member of the Employees' Pension System on a certain date; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - Membership and Benefits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
2020-03-17SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {304760/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-03-12HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-03-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {449738/1 Adopted
2020-03-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB683 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions30302(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions30303(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions30307(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback