MD SB95 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the name of the Recreational License Donation Fund to the Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund; extending the termination date for certain provisions of law establishing the recreational license donation program; etc.
Title
Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {360111/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {404132/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Commerce and Business
Data
Disabilities
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Funds Transfer
Electronic Government
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Gifts
Grants
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Liens
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Security Deposits
Sports and Recreation
Sunset
Titles
Veterans
Coastal Bays
Commerce and Business
Data
Disabilities
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Funds Transfer
Electronic Government
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Gifts
Grants
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Liens
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Security Deposits
Sports and Recreation
Sunset
Titles
Veterans