MD SB948 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an electric school bus pilot program; requiring the Public Service Commission to implement and administer the pilot program; authorizing investor-owned electric companies to apply to the Commission to implement an electric school bus pilot program with a participating school system if the pilot program meets certain standards; and authorizing investor-owned electric companies to recover certain costs under the pilot program, subject to the approval of the Commission.
Title
Public Utilities – Electric School Bus Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2022-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB696 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Subjects
Contracts
Energy Matters
Environmental Health
Health
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Safety
School Buses
Students
Utility Regulation
Energy Matters
Environmental Health
Health
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Safety
School Buses
Students
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0948?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0948f.pdf |