MD SB938 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that criminal sentencing guidelines adopted by the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy set forth a range of increased severity for defendants who have been previously adjudicated delinquent.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Sentencing Guidelines – Previously Adjudicated Delinquent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |