MD SB93 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person to operate or give permission to operate a vessel for certain purposes in a slalom ski course located in a controlled water ski area in Maynadier Creek during certain times on certain days; prohibiting a person from operating or giving permission to operate a vessel for certain purposes in a slalom ski course located in a controlled water ski area in Maynadier Creek on Saturdays or State holidays; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report on the Act's implementation by December 1, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Area in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {563325/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (27-108) (Y: 27 N: 108 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-50) (Y: 87 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (87-50)
2019-04-05HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFloor Amendment {563325/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (27-108)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {460019/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2019-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {534433/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-18SenateHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-11SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0093&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0093f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0093t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0093e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0093_53443301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0093_46001901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0093_56332501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0093.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0093_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0323.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0093_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1344.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1345.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1234.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback