MD SB923 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that specified departments of State government and specified units in specified departments of State government are prohibited from denying a specified license to an applicant solely on the basis that the applicant has previously been convicted of a crime except in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring specified departments of State government and each unit that issues specified licenses in specified departments to post specified notice on their Web sites in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Occupational Licenses - Denial for Criminal Conviction - Notice of Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {324335/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Annotated Code of Maryland
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Law - Procedure
Environment, Department of
Ex-Offenders
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Registration
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Annotated Code of Maryland
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Law - Procedure
Environment, Department of
Ex-Offenders
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Registration
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology