MD SB923 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county-owned and county-operated park or facility that is hosting a public festival to offer for sale or sell specified types of homemade-style food under specified circumstances; and adding honey to the list of homemade-style food that may be offered for sale or sold under a specified provision of law.
Title
Carroll County - Homemade Food Sales - County Parks and Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-25 | Re-referred Finance | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Senate Rules |