MD SB917 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the duties of behavioral health services coordinators and the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports regarding duties related to implementing Restorative Practices Schools throughout the State; requiring the State Department of Education to develop a comprehensive plan to implement requirements for the establishment of Restorative Practices Schools; and requiring the Department to annually report to the General Assembly on the implementation of Restorative Practices Schools beginning December 1, 2026.
Title
Public Schools – Restorative Practices Schools – Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB1257 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-18 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Subjects
Communications
Data
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Discipline
Education
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Job Training
Mediation
Mental and Behavioral Health
Physically Disabled Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Racial Matters
Records
Reports
School Administration
Standards and Best Practices
Students
Substance Abuse
Teachers
Trauma Informed Approach
Truancy
Data
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Discipline
Education
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Job Training
Mediation
Mental and Behavioral Health
Physically Disabled Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Racial Matters
Records
Reports
School Administration
Standards and Best Practices
Students
Substance Abuse
Teachers
Trauma Informed Approach
Truancy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 447 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 447.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 452 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0917?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0917f.pdf |