MD SB912 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, clarifying, and expanding certain provisions of law relating to the immunity from liability of a parent who leaves an unharmed newborn with a responsible adult under certain circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Human Services to develop, implement, and maintain a public information program to inform the public about the Maryland Safe Haven Program; and requiring the Secretary of Human Services to annually submit a report to the General Assembly about the Maryland Safe Haven Program beginning December 31, 2025.
Title
Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Awareness and Outreach
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Government
Electronic Surveillance
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Health Care Facilities
Hospitals
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Liability
Parents and Guardians
Paternity
Publications
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Services - Generally
Video
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Government
Electronic Surveillance
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Health Care Facilities
Hospitals
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Liability
Parents and Guardians
Paternity
Publications
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Services - Generally
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 641 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |