MD SB888 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the placement and use of speed monitoring systems on Maryland Route 175 (Jessup Road) in Anne Arundel County between the Maryland Route 175/295 interchange and the Anne Arundel County-Howard County line, subject to certain placement and signage requirements; requiring a certain real-time display of a driver's traveling speed for a speed monitoring system operating on Maryland Route 175 (Jessup Road) between the Maryland Route 175/295 interchange and the Anne Arundel County-Howard County line; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 175 (Jessup Road)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 373120/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 88 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 373120/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 88 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-39) |
2021-04-12 | House | Floor Amendment {373120/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-88) |
2021-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-10 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {170011/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-30 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Boundaries
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Boundaries
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |