MD SB873 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a hospital to annually submit a report to the Health Services Cost Review Commission on the total number of patients by race or ethnicity, gender, and zip code against whom the hospital has filed an action to collect a debt, or to whom the hospital has and has not reported or classified a bad debt, and the total amount of costs owed but not collected; requiring that a certain policy provide a mechanism to a patient to modify a payment plan and prohibit the hospital from collecting a certain debt for a certain patient; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2020-03-04SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-07SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB1081 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19214.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback