MD SB873 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $80,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Perry Hall Recreation and Parks Council for specified development or improvement purposes related to the Perry Hall Creative Playground, located in Baltimore County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Perry Hall Creative Playground
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Community Facilities and Services
Municipal Corporations
Sports and Recreation
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Community Facilities and Services
Municipal Corporations
Sports and Recreation
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)