MD SB869 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-09 - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-09 - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs to convene a workgroup to explore issues of reconciliation processes and racial equity that includes specified stakeholders; requiring the workgroup to hold hearings and evaluate specified issues relating to race and social justice, study racial disparities and institutional bias, and determine best practices, strategies, and legislation; and requiring the workgroup to submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019.
Title
Governor's Office of Minority Affairs - Workgroup on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2016-03-29 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {764835/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Discrimination
Education
Ethnic Affairs
Health
Hearings
Housing
Human Relations
Human Rights
Minorities
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Discrimination
Education
Ethnic Affairs
Health
Hearings
Housing
Human Relations
Human Rights
Minorities
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment