MD SB865 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain requirements related to the provision of information regarding opioid use disorder by the Maryland Department of Health, the prescribing of opioids, and the filling of prescriptions for monitored prescription drugs; establishing certain civil and criminal immunity; requiring a health care provider to make a good-faith effort to maintain the previous dosage of and regimen for a controlled dangerous substance and make certain referrals for a certain patient; etc.
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances and Treatment of Chronic Pain and Long-Term Oxygen Use Patients (Continuity of Care Act of 2022)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Communications
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Data
Drugs
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Opioids
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Substance Abuse
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Data
Drugs
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Opioids
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Substance Abuse
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 1 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 1 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 1 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 1 | 223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |