MD SB863 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a personal needs allowance of not less than $450 per month or $5,400 per year for certain Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients who receive certain long-term care services and supports.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Long-Term Care Services and Supports - Personal Needs Allowance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1091 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Blind Persons
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Patients
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Vulnerable Adults
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Patients
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 122.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0863?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0863f.pdf |