MD SB857 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Behavioral Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence within the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services; requiring the Center to monitor and analyze its models, plans, policies, strategies, programs, technical assistance, and training in order to identify opportunities to reduce and eliminate disparities in the criminalization of racial minorities with behavioral health disorders; requiring the Office to appoint certain individuals to oversee the Center; etc.
Title
Health - Maryland Behavioral Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {776688/1 Adopted |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {847575/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1280 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Subjects
Communications
Contracts
Counties
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Emergency Services
Examinations
Federal Aid
Grants
Health
Higher Education
Housing
Inspections
Job Training
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Public Health
Public Safety
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Rural Areas
Social Services
State Universities and Colleges
Substance Abuse
Transportation
Veterans
Contracts
Counties
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Emergency Services
Examinations
Federal Aid
Grants
Health
Higher Education
Housing
Inspections
Job Training
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Public Health
Public Safety
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Rural Areas
Social Services
State Universities and Colleges
Substance Abuse
Transportation
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 4201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |